|
04/25/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2442.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2787.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
July 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1289.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1152.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 822.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|