California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB333 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015