California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB334 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Amended

Bill September 3, 2015
Bill August 28, 2015
Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 9, 2015
Bill June 3, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015