LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB334
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB334
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB334
Compare Versions
SB334 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB334 Amended September 3, 2015
SB334 Amended August 28, 2015
SB334 Amended August 17, 2015
SB334 Amended July 16, 2015
SB334 Amended July 9, 2015
SB334 Amended June 3, 2015
SB334 Amended April 20, 2015
SB334 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB334 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB334 Amended September 3, 2015
SB334 Amended August 28, 2015
SB334 Amended August 17, 2015
SB334 Amended July 16, 2015
SB334 Amended July 9, 2015
SB334 Amended June 3, 2015
SB334 Amended April 20, 2015
SB334 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare