California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB337 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill June 16, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015