LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB337
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB337
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB337
Compare Versions
SB337 Chaptered October 6, 2015
SB337 Enrolled September 8, 2015
SB337 Amended September 1, 2015
SB337 Amended June 16, 2015
SB337 Amended April 13, 2015
SB337 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB337 Chaptered October 6, 2015
SB337 Enrolled September 8, 2015
SB337 Amended September 1, 2015
SB337 Amended June 16, 2015
SB337 Amended April 13, 2015
SB337 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare