|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 764, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2416.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2686.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 839.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 545.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|