LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB361
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB361
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB361
Compare Versions
SB361 Chaptered October 10, 2015
SB361 Enrolled September 3, 2015
SB361 Amended August 27, 2015
SB361 Amended August 17, 2015
SB361 Amended July 16, 2015
SB361 Amended July 2, 2015
SB361 Amended April 14, 2015
SB361 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB361 Chaptered October 10, 2015
SB361 Enrolled September 3, 2015
SB361 Amended August 27, 2015
SB361 Amended August 17, 2015
SB361 Amended July 16, 2015
SB361 Amended July 2, 2015
SB361 Amended April 14, 2015
SB361 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare