|
04/25/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2775.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3180.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 11). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3102.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
August 17 set for first hearing. Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1253.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1153.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
May 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 725.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|