California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB377 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Amended

Bill September 11, 2015
Bill August 25, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill May 12, 2015
Bill April 29, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015