Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/05/2016 | January 13 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2016 | Set for hearing January 13. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | April 29 set for first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |