|
09/01/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 234, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2047.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 2427.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 1100.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 984.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|