LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB382
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB382
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB382
Compare Versions
SB382 Chaptered September 1, 2015
SB382 Enrolled August 19, 2015
SB382 Amended July 8, 2015
SB382 Amended June 15, 2015
SB382 Amended May 19, 2015
SB382 Amended April 20, 2015
SB382 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB382 Chaptered September 1, 2015
SB382 Enrolled August 19, 2015
SB382 Amended July 8, 2015
SB382 Amended June 15, 2015
SB382 Amended May 19, 2015
SB382 Amended April 20, 2015
SB382 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare