|
09/04/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 272, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2142.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2534.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1120.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 983.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
May 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 649.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|