California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB385 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 4, 2015

Amended

Bill June 18, 2015
Bill May 19, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015