|
09/02/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 246, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2431.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1071.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 983.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|