California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB386 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 2, 2015

Amended

Bill July 1, 2015
Bill June 23, 2015