|
10/06/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 537, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2752.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3094.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1075.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 983.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|