California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB387 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 28, 2015
Bill July 15, 2015