|
10/02/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 450, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2674.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Set for hearing September 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2842.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 2303.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1027.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 796.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|