California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB399 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill June 25, 2015