|
08/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 229, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5028.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5824.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2016
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 5736.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 954.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 907.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|