California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB404 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 17, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 11, 2016
Bill September 2, 2015