California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB413 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill September 3, 2015
Bill July 1, 2015
Bill June 22, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015