LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB413
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB413
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB413
Compare Versions
SB413 Chaptered October 10, 2015
SB413 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB413 Amended September 3, 2015
SB413 Amended July 1, 2015
SB413 Amended June 22, 2015
SB413 Amended April 16, 2015
SB413 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB413 Chaptered October 10, 2015
SB413 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB413 Amended September 3, 2015
SB413 Amended July 1, 2015
SB413 Amended June 22, 2015
SB413 Amended April 16, 2015
SB413 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare