|
09/01/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 235, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2048.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 30. Page 2426.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 927.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 723.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|