California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB415 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 1, 2015

Amended

Bill June 23, 2015
Bill April 28, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015