|
04/25/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2660.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 4. Page 2961.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1193.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1146.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 417.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|