California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB42 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 2, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Amended

Bill September 2, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill July 14, 2015
Bill July 1, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015