|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 734, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5571.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6365.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5517.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2015
|
June 16 hearing: Held in committee for interim study.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 879.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 729.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|