California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB420 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2016
Bill June 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 11, 2016
Bill April 27, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015