|
07/15/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1790.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2173.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 843.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 725.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|