California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB422 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 15, 2015

Amended

Bill June 18, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015