California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB425 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill June 14, 2016
Bill August 17, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015