LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB425
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB425
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB425
Compare Versions
SB425 Chaptered September 23, 2016
SB425 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB425 Amended June 14, 2016
SB425 Amended August 17, 2015
SB425 Amended April 21, 2015
SB425 Amended April 6, 2015
SB425 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB425 Chaptered September 23, 2016
SB425 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB425 Amended June 14, 2016
SB425 Amended August 17, 2015
SB425 Amended April 21, 2015
SB425 Amended April 6, 2015
SB425 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare