|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 648, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2421.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2726.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 17)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
July 7 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1194.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1146.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 859.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|