California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB43 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015