|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 803, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5474.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5436.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Set for hearing August 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5326.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6014.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
June 22 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
July 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2015
|
June 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 929.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 728.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 526.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|