California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB438 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill March 2, 2016
Bill February 22, 2016
Bill September 3, 2015
Bill June 29, 2015
Bill June 3, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015