BILL NUMBER: SB 438AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 22, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 3, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 29, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 3, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 6, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hill Senators Hill and Hertzberg ( Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Gray ) FEBRUARY 25, 2015 An act to amend Section 8587.8 of the Government Code, relating to earthquake safety. safety, and making an appropriation therefor . LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 438, as amended, Hill. Earthquake safety. safety: statewide earthquake early warning system: funding. Existing (1) Existing law creates, as an independent unit within the Business, Consumer Services, and Housing Agency, the Alfred E. Alquist Seismic Safety Commission, and provides that the commission is responsible for certain duties related to earthquake hazard mitigation, including, among others, helping to coordinate the earthquake safety activities of government at all levels. This bill would declare the intent of the Legislature to work with the Administration through the fall 2015 recess in order to establish a California Earthquake Safety Board by July 1, 2016. (2) Existing law requires the Office of Emergency Services, in collaboration with the commission and other specified entities, to develop a comprehensive statewide earthquake early warning system in California through a public-private partnership, as specified. Existing law requires the office to identify funding for the system through single or multiple sources of revenue, and requires those sources to exclude the General Fund and to be limited to federal funds, funds from revenue bonds, local funds, and funds from private sources. Under existing law, the requirement that the office develop the system is not operative until funding is identified, and is repealed if funding is not identified by July 1, 2016. This bill would discontinue the requirement that the funding sources for the system exclude the General Fund and be limited to federal funds, funds from revenue bonds, local funds, and funds from private sources. The bill would delete the provisions providing for the repeal and the contingent operation of the requirement that the office develop the system. The bill would appropriate $23,100,000 from the General Fund to the office for the purpose of implementing the system. Vote: majority 2/3 . Appropriation: no yes . Fiscal committee: no yes . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares that mitigation against earthquake damage must be addressed in the immediate term and that it intends to work with the Administration through the fall 2015 recess in order to establish a California Earthquake Safety Board by July 1, 2016. SEC. 2. Section 8587.8 of the Government Code is amended to read: 8587.8. (a) The Office of Emergency Services, in collaboration with the California Institute of Technology (Caltech), the California Geological Survey, the University of California, the United States Geological Survey, the Alfred E. Alquist Seismic Safety Commission, and other stakeholders, shall develop a comprehensive statewide earthquake early warning system in California through a public-private partnership, which shall include, but not be limited to, the following features: (1) Installation of field sensors. (2) Improvement of field telemetry. (3) Construction and testing of central processing and notification centers. (4) Establishment of warning notification distribution paths to the public. (5) Integration of earthquake early warning education with general earthquake preparedness efforts. (b) In consultation with stakeholders, the Office of Emergency Services shall develop an approval mechanism to review compliance with earthquake early warning standards as they are developed. The development of the approval mechanism shall include input from a broad representation of earthquake early warning stakeholders. The approval mechanism shall accomplish all of the following: (1) Ensure the standards are appropriate. (2) Determine the degree to which the standards apply to providers and components of the system. (3) Determine methods to ensure compliance with the standards. (4) Determine requirements for participation in the system. (c) The Office of Emergency Services shall identify funding for the system described in subdivision (a) through single or multiple sources of revenue that shall be limited to federal funds, funds from revenue bonds, local funds, and funds from private sources. The Office of Emergency Services shall not identify the General Fund as a funding source for the purpose of establishing the system described in subdivision (a), beyond the components or programs that are currently funded. revenue. (d) Subdivisions (a) and (b) shall not become operative until the Office of Emergency Services identifies funding pursuant to subdivision (c). (e) (1) If funding is not identified pursuant to subdivision (c) by July 1, 2016, this section is repealed unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2017, deletes or extends that date. (2) The Office of Emergency Services shall file with the Secretary of State its determination that funding was not identified pursuant to subdivision (c) by July 1, 2016. SEC. 3. The sum of twenty-three million one hundred thousand dollars ($23,100,000) is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to the Office of Emergency Services for the purpose of implementing a comprehensive statewide earthquake early warning system pursuant to Section 8587.8 of the Government Code.