|
09/03/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 259, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2015
|
Ordered to enrgrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2015
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Held at desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2176.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 953.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 814.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|