California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB440 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 3, 2015

Amended

Bill April 13, 2015