|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 772, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5358.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6099.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5642.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3102.) Art. IV. Sec. 8(b) of the Constitution dispensed with. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3103.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2363.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2216.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
August 24 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Set for hearing August 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1960.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Set for hearing July 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
April 21 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|