California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB448 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 27, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill June 17, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015