|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 832, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5475.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 5437.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Set for hearing August 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5326.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 31. Page 6118.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5867.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
July 15 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 994.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 723.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|