LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB450
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB450
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB450
Compare Versions
SB450 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB450 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB450 Amended August 18, 2016
SB450 Amended August 15, 2016
SB450 Amended June 21, 2016
SB450 Amended July 7, 2015
SB450 Amended June 15, 2015
SB450 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB450 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB450 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB450 Amended August 18, 2016
SB450 Amended August 15, 2016
SB450 Amended June 21, 2016
SB450 Amended July 7, 2015
SB450 Amended June 15, 2015
SB450 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare