|
09/21/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 315, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2366.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2687.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1024.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 592.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|