California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB462 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2015

Amended

Bill August 27, 2015
Bill May 11, 2015
Bill April 8, 2015