California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB464 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2015

Amended

Bill May 22, 2015
Bill April 27, 2015