LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB464
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB464
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB464
Compare Versions
SB464 Chaptered September 30, 2015
SB464 Enrolled August 31, 2015
SB464 Amended May 22, 2015
SB464 Amended April 27, 2015
SB464 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB464 Chaptered September 30, 2015
SB464 Enrolled August 31, 2015
SB464 Amended May 22, 2015
SB464 Amended April 27, 2015
SB464 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare